Friday, July 22, 2011

Vedic Mathematics - Multiplication Nikhilam Method

5 comments:

  1. sir if 1st no. is not near to base but 2nd no. is near to it , then we can apply this or not ???

    ReplyDelete
  2. to find the square ending in 5 s
    25*25=2(2+1) and 25 gives 625
    35*35=3(3+1) and 25 gives 1225
    95*95=9(9+10abd 25 gives 9095

    to multiply24*26 = 2(2+1)and 24 gives 624
    78*72=7(7+1) and 16 gives 5616..and so on

    ending in 25
    625*625=6(6and half)*10 and 625=390625
    725*725=7(7 and half)*10and 625=525625
    try more, i dont know that i explained here is related to vedic maths.

    ReplyDelete
  3. Thank you Vijayan sir for sharing.

    ReplyDelete
  4. All the contents you mentioned in post is too good and can be very useful. I will keep it in mind, thanks for sharing the information keep updating, looking forward for more posts.

    -
    Vedic maths


    ReplyDelete
  5. hey,
    Nice information shared ,, vedic math is just a tecnique to calculate fast so there is no harm to learn it as soon as possible..
    To learn fast and solve the problems in limited period of time vedic mathematics playes an important role. It can be applied in competitive exams.
    and now its easy to lean vedic math online also one of the site I came across was http://www.wiziq.com/course/1507-vedic-mathematics-complete-certified-course
    This vedic math online course may be helpful for all those who are scared of mathematics.

    ReplyDelete